+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 28, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 14 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 7 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 2 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor