+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 4 NO 1 ABSENT
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Restored in House
- Roll Call Rescinded in House
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 13 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 13 - Defeated By House. Votes: 16 YES 24 NO 1 ABSENT
- Passed By House. Votes: 30 YES 10 NO 1 ABSENT
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Defeated By House. Votes: 25 YES 12 NO 1 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 On Its Merits
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
+ − Amendment
HA 1
This amendment clarifies that municipalities may enact dog breed specific language.
+ − Votes (3)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
: House Vote
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 10
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor