+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On September 8, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Corrections) in House with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Corrections Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor