+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 31, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 10 On Its Merits
On December 13, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20