+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On October 27, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
- Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
- Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 Favorable
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 119 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 119 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor