+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 31, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate
- Lifted From Table in Senate
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid On Table in Senate
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (AGRICULTURE) in Senate with 5 Favorable
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (AGRICULTURE) in House with 7 Favorable
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House
+ − Amendment
SA 1 to HB 116
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
June 13, 2013: HB 116 w/SA 1 Viola Passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Absent: 2
June 13, 2013: HB 116 w/SA 1 Viola Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Absent: 2
June 13, 2013: SA 1 to HB 116 Marshall Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Absent: 2
May 9, 2013: HB 116 Viola Passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor