+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On October 26, 2018 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On July 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
- Amendment SA 1 to HB 113 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On July 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 1 NO 3 ABSENT
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 6 NO 1 ABSENT
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 113 - Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 113 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 12 On Its Merits
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House
+ − Votes (3)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 6
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor