+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 104 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 104 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21