+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 19, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
- Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Suspension of Rules in House
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 100 - Stricken
- Amendment HA 2 to HB 100 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
On June 4, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 5 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment HA 2 to HB 100 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 100 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 11 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor