+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1841H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 21103284D-H1
- Read second time
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 21103284D-H1
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101287D