+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 10, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0894)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's rec. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 894 (effective 7/1/97)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2671ER)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 27, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2671ER)
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1997 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 977859188-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 977859188-H1
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 977859188-H1
- Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 4
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 974272188