+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A5029a
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
- Amended (t) 2270a
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.169
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
+ − Vote
February 27, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Energy And Telecommunications)
- Yeas: 9