+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.310
On December 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.401
- Substituted For A1118a
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1758
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5221a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Health
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (2)
June 13, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 13, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor