+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 14, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436)
On April 4, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 436 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 14, 2000 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 10, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1312ER)
On February 29, 2000 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (90-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 6-N 1-A)
- Reconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (87-Y 7-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (87-Y 7-N 2-A)
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 001912536-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 001912536-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 001912536-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 1-N)
On February 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 10-N 4-A)
- Read third time and passed House (81-Y 10-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 001909608-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 001909608-H1
On February 13, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 001909608-H1
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub (25-Y 3-N)
On February 8, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 2-N)
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 005009246
+ − Votes (8)
February 29, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 6-N 1-A)
February 29, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (87-Y 7-N 2-A)
February 25, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2000: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 1-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 10-N 4-A)
February 11, 2000: Reported from Appropriations with sub (25-Y 3-N)
February 8, 2000: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor