+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0716)
On March 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 716 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1104ER)
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (36-Y 1-N 3-A)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (36-Y 1-N 3-A)
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- Title replaced
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
On February 17, 1997 in the House:
- Committee amendment #7 rejected
- Read third time
- Committee amendments #1 thru 6 & 8 thru 10 agreed to
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 0-N)
- Amendment by Mr. Woodrum agreed to
- Amendment by Mr. Croshaw agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments (92-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from C. I. B. w/amds. (19-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
On February 5, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Norment rejected
- Amendment by Sen. Earley rejected
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 974189607-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (36-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 6-N 3-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (28-Y 6-N 3-A)
- Communicated to House
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with amendments (11-Y 2-N 2-A)
On January 28, 1997 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. & L. sub-committee: #3
On January 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 974189607
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (7)
February 19, 1997: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (36-Y 1-N 3-A)
February 17, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1997: Reported from C. I. B. w/amds. (19-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (36-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (28-Y 6-N 3-A)
February 3, 1997: Reported from C. & L. with amendments (11-Y 2-N 2-A)
+ − Sponsors (75)
Type:
Primary Sponsor