+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- Adopted, House
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 487
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Adopted, Senate
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 418
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 04/23
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Nomination Referred to Committee on Judiciary