+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 27
- Senate Calendar Number 58
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/18 5:00 PM
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Favorable
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed with Senate Clerks
+ − Vote
March 9, 2018: JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor