+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- Adopted, House
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 579
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Adopted, Senate
- Rules Suspended
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 503
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 05/22
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Nomination Referred to Committee on Judiciary
+ − Vote
May 22, 2017: JUD Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3