+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- Adopted, House
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 351
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Senate
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 159
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/25
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor