+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- Adopted, House
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 314
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Immediate Transmittal to the House
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Adopted, Senate
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 270
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 04/07
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor