+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- Adopted, House
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 414
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Adopted, Senate
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 313
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 04/12
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations
+ − Vote
April 12, 2018: EXN Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 13
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor