+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 864
- Senate Calendar Number 555
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/18/15 5:00 PM
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Favorable
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 05/11
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Senate Clerks
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor