+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 29, 2022 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- Adopted, House
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 307
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Immediate Transmittal to the House
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Senate
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 118
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/24
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Nomination Referred to Committee on Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor