+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- Adopted, House
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 121
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Adopted, Senate
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 66
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/17
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor