+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- Adopted, House
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 277
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Adopted, Senate
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 23
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Nomination Referred to Committee on Judiciary
+ − Vote
February 27, 2018: JUD Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 41