+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- Adopted, House
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 109
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Adopted, Senate
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 20
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/23
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor