+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 514
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Adopted, Senate
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 276
- Senate Calendar Number 154
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 5:00 PM
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Vote
March 10, 2017: GAE Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 16
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor