+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Veterans' Affairs
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 301
- File Number 492
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/17
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Sponsors (4)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor