+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Act 15-49
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 567
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on General Law
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 495
- Senate Calendar Number 308
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/18
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Votes (2)
May 26, 2015: House Roll Call Vote 214
- Yeas: 147
- Absent: 4
May 14, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 195
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor