+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act 19-132
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10697
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 730
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- In Concurrence
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 841
- Senate Calendar Number 442
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/25
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor