+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 598
- Senate Calendar Number 294
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/08
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Sponsor
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor