+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-55
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 557
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6176
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 6151
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 538
- Senate Calendar Number 396
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/13 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/15
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
May 16, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 194 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 133
- Absent: 17
May 8, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 202 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 6151
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 23
May 8, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 220 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (15)
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor