+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 378
- Senate Calendar Number 200
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Sponsor
Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor