+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Act 17-163
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 570
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 674
- Senate Calendar Number 356
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/17 5:00 PM
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/24
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Vote
March 31, 2017: JUD Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 39
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor