+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act 21-55
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- In Concurrence
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 505
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8481
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 155
- File Number 193
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/09
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Aging Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor