+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 814
- Senate Calendar Number 494
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/11/15 5:00 PM
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Education
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations
+ − Sponsor
Program Review and Investigations Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor