+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-178
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 653
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7782
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Public Health
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Human Services
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 195
- Senate Calendar Number 177
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 317 SENATE AMD A
- Yeas: 142
- Absent: 8
May 31, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 318 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 142
- Absent: 8
May 23, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 370 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (50)
Children Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor