+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-14
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 492
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 537
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 395
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/13 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/15
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Votes (2)
May 8, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 114
- Yeas: 137
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 7
May 1, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 192 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (5)
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor