+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Special Act 13-20
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 555
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 421
- Senate Calendar Number 284
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 5:00 PM
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/18
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 6, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 424 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 146
- Absent: 4
May 8, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 214 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (2)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor