+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Special Act 17-2
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 544
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 443
- Senate Calendar Number 229
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/17 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/09
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Vote
March 21, 2017: CE Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor