+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Act 17-162
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 446
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 376
- Senate Calendar Number 189
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 10:00 AM
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/09
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Votes (2)
April 19, 2017: Senate Roll Call Vote 81
- Yeas: 36
March 16, 2017: CE Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor