+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-181
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 626
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
- Matter Pass Retained
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 562
- Senate Calendar Number 411
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 350
- Yeas: 138
- Absent: 12
May 21, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 344 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (27)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor