+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Recommitted to Children
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Education
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6068
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Education
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 156
- Senate Calendar Number 151
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Children
Type:
Primary Sponsor