+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act 19-63
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 472
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7133
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 326
- Senate Calendar Number 152
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Education Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor