+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 667
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8280
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 265
- Senate Calendar Number 223
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/26
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
May 30, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 425 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor