+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act 21-53
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 534
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7906
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- File Number 291
- Senate Calendar Number 182
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/04
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Energy and Technology Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor