+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-4
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
- In Concurrence
On April 19, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 412
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 74
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- File Number 54
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Votes (2)
April 28, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 165
- Yeas: 142
- Absent: 9
April 17, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 113 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor