+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Act 17-67
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 603
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7910
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 565
- Senate Calendar Number 300
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/17 5:00 PM
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Education
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
March 20, 2017: ED Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Education Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor