+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Planning and Development
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor