+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 1, 2019 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 708
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 839
- Senate Calendar Number 440
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor